Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Potts, Peter George Gilmour (CPSO#: 58721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202 - 475 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4V5
Phone: (519) 744-8561
Fax: (519) 744-3089
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Potts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gingell-Potts ( CPSO# 58761 )
Dr. P. Potts ( CPSO# 58721 )

Business Address:
Unit 7
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1

Business Address:
202 - 475 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4V5
Phone Number: (519) 744-8561


Corporation Name: Dr. Ruth Gingell-Potts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gingell-Potts ( CPSO# 58761 )
Dr. P. Potts ( CPSO# 58721 )

Business Address:
Greenbrook Family Medical Centre
421 Greenbrook Drive
Suite 7
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 570-1655

Business Address:
202 - 475 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4V5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GEORGE GILMOUR POTTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1991

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On August 27, 2009, at the The Superior Court of Justice, in Hamilton, Ontario, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Potts.