Poulopoulos, Vassilios (CPSO#: 55066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Athens, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 303
100 Colborne Street
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y9
Phone: (705) 325-0077
Fax: (705) 325-0677
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Poulopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Poulopoulos ( CPSO# 55066 )

Business Address:
Unit 303
100 Colborne Street
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y9
Phone Number: (705) 325-0077

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VASSILIOS POULOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POULOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1992