Poulos, Elena (CPSO#: 71309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1000
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 231-0100
Fax: (416) 231-0109
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elena Poulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Poulos ( CPSO# 71309 )

Business Address:
1000 - 1243 Islington Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 231-0100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA POULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002