Pound, Catherine Maude (CPSO#: 77702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Khayat, Catherine Maude (used until: 08 Sep 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2701
Fax: (613) 738-4878
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MAUDE POUND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POUND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2007