Pourdowlat, Afsaneh (CPSO#: 73857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian, Turkish

Education:Ege University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 214
955 Major Mackenzie West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 303-5701
Fax: (905) 303-9813
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie health Richmondhill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 833-1212 Ext. 2310
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

ACD MED
211-77
QUEENSWAY WEST
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Canada
Phone: 905 949 6647
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pourdowlat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFSANEH POURDOWLAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POURDOWLAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2004