Poutanen, Susan Marie (CPSO#: 70104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: Davison, Susan Marie (used until: 22 Oct 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Microbiology
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 1485
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-3139
Fax: (416) 586-8746
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
University Health Network,Hillcrest Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Rumsey Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARIE POUTANEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POUTANEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2004