Povitz, Marcus (CPSO#: 90439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C Victoria Hospital
Division of Respirology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 53085
Fax: (519) 685-8406
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M Povitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Povitz ( CPSO# 90439 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Respirology
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite E6-202
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 02 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCUS POVITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POVITZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2009 to 20 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2014