Powar, Sukhbinderjit Kaur (CPSO#: 69406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Glasgow, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
3095 Glen Erin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1J3
Phone: (905) 820-1046
Fax: (905) 820-1899
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2180 ITABASHI WAY
Burlington ON  L7M5A5
Canada
Phone: 905 332 9930
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Powar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Powar ( CPSO# 69406 )

Business Address:
4 - 3095 Glen Erin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1J3
Phone Number: (905) 820-1046

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUKHBINDERJIT KAUR POWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1997