Powel-Smith, Cyril John (CPSO#: 16370)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 29 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Sep 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 1995