Powell, Alan Harlan (CPSO#: 18001)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2013