Powell, Frank Stanton (CPSO#: 68356)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Medical College of Georgia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1995