Powell, Gordon William Wesley (CPSO#: 22882)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon W. W. Powell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017