Powell, James Nelson (CPSO#: 57457)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 2007