Powell, Mark Richard (CPSO#: 81211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mitchell Family Doctors
7 Frances Street
Mitchell ON  N0K 1N0
Phone: (519) 348-8402
Fax: (519) 348-8400
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Powell Turner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Powell ( CPSO# 81211 )
Dr. M. Turner ( CPSO# 81286 )

Business Address:
Mitchell Family Doctors
7 Frances Street
Mitchell ON  N0K 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 348-8402

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK RICHARD POWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006