Powell-Francis, Kathryn Anne (CPSO#: 58825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Pain Clinic
Unit 425
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone: (416) 438-7080
Fax: (416) 438-7072
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sensenbrenner Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Canada
Phone: (705) 337-6111
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.A. Powell-Francis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Powell-Francis ( CPSO# 58825 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Pain Clinic
425 - 1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 438-7080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANNE POWELL-FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWELL-FRANCIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1990