Power, Barbara Elizabeth (CPSO#: 53014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Geriatric Assessment Unit
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16486
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. E. Power Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Power ( CPSO# 53014 )

Business Address:
Geriatric Assessment Unit
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4795

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ELIZABETH POWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1984