Power, Christopher Noble (CPSO#: 55846)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2002