Power, Daniel Jonathan (CPSO#: 85560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Civic Campus Suite B310
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137985555 Ext. 14169
Fax: 6137615209
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel J. Power Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Power ( CPSO# 85560 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Civic Hospital
Suite B310
1053 Carling Avenue
Department of Anesthesia
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JONATHAN POWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2007 to 04 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2008 to 04 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2009 to 04 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006