Power, Heather Renee (CPSO#: 97148)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 17 May 2016 to 12 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 2016