Power, Kevin Victor (CPSO#: 69895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
One Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 321-8213
Fax: (613) 321-8369
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin V. Power Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Power ( CPSO# 69895 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 321-8213

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN VICTOR POWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001