Power, Stephanie Michelle (CPSO#: 86505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
199 Avenue Road, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Phone: 416-962-1010
Fax: 416-962-1011
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Power Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Power ( CPSO# 86505 )

Business Address:
199 Avenue Road
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 962-1010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MICHELLE POWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013