Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Power, Stephen George Alexander (CPSO#: 58231)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Power Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016