Powis, Jeff Earl (CPSO#: 74878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6252
Fax: (416) 469-6253
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Community Hepatitis C Prog
955 Queens Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-1925
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Powis and Culbert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Culbert ( CPSO# 74860 )
Dr. J. Powis ( CPSO# 74878 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6252

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Phone Number: (416) 461-1925

Business Address:
Sunnybrook and Womens HSC
A-103
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4936

Business Address:
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone Number: (416) 324-4180

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFF EARL POWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004