Powles, Alexander Charles Peter (CPSO#: 26939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Room T2137
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34299
Fax: (905) 540-6594
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Powles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Powles ( CPSO# 26939 )
Dr. T. Kaigas ( CPSO# 29385 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
T2137 - 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CHARLES PETER POWLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWLES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1976