Poynter, Brittany Anne (CPSO#: 82521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
College Street Site
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 30403
Fax: (416) 979-8501
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luke T. Bearss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bearss ( CPSO# 82438 )
Dr. B. Poynter ( CPSO# 82521 )

Business Address:
Family Practice Unit
Floor 4
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-5158

Business Address:
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1L8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRITTANY ANNE POYNTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POYNTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010