Pozzi, Anthony Constantine (CPSO#: 72215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
windsor regional hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2930 Dominion Blvd
Windsor ON  N9E 2M2
Canada
Phone: 226-773-6260
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Pozzi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pozzi ( CPSO# 72215 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 1L8
Phone Number: (519) 979-3355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY CONSTANTINE POZZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POZZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2000