Prabhakaran, Sivashankary Yuwaraj (CPSO#: 86866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Hill Medical Centre
Unit 3
4637 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 2P8
Phone: (416) 283 4111
Fax: (416) 283 4114
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sivashankary Prabhakaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Prabhakaran ( CPSO# 86866 )

Business Address:
West Hill Medical Centre
4637 Kingston Road
Unit 3
Toronto ON  M1E 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 283-4111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIVASHANKARY YUWARAJ PRABHAKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRABHAKARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009