Prabhu, Pooja Dhume (CPSO#: 94429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Washington University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Med Medical Building
Suite 206
7131 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Z1
Phone: (905) 731-7596
Fax: (905) 731-4975
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Newman Breastfeeding Clinic
1255 Sheppard Avenue E
Toronto ON  M2K 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 498-0002
Fax: (416) 498-0012
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. D. Prabhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Prabhu ( CPSO# 94429 )

Business Address:
The Canadian College of Naturopathic Medicine
1255 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 498-0002

Business Address:
North Med Medical Building
Suite 206
7131 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Z1
Phone Number: (905) 731-7596

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Louisiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Sep 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Pooja Dhume Prabhu may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics in an
            office based setting, only.