Prabhu, Vijayalaxmi (CPSO#: 46011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
J5
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Fax: (613) 544-9666
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prabhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Prabhu ( CPSO# 46011 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Unit J5
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIJAYALAXMI PRABHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRABHU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1974 to 14 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1998