Prabhudesai, Vikramaditya (CPSO#: 81446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 May 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 6702
Fax: (416) 864-5380
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikramaditya Prabhudesai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. J. Barfett ( CPSO# 84352 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )
Dr. G. Mnatzakanian ( CPSO# 88831 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 May 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 May 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Vikramaditya Prabhudesai may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            and interventional radiology, only.