Pradier Silva, Mariana (CPSO#: 58881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Burr 2 - Rm. 21.2.005
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3833
Fax: (613) 548-2364
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIANA PRADIER SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRADIER SILVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988