Praglowski, Bozena J (CPSO#: 69157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kipling Heights Centre
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Phone: (416) 741-4545 Ext. 260
Fax: (416) 744-1484
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Millway Medical Centre
Unit 17
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Canada
Phone: (905) 607-0017
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bozena J. Praglowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 30 2016

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOZENA J PRAGLOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAGLOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997