Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Prakash, Chander (CPSO#: 31347)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Burmese, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Univ of Rangoon, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2000