Prakash, Suma (CPSO#: 73417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temple University
1801 N Broad St
Philadelphia PA  19122
United States
Phone: (215) 204-7000
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sankar Prakash Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Prakash ( CPSO# 29579 )
Dr. S. Prakash ( CPSO# 73417 )

Business Address:
Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4400

Business Address:
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Phone Number: (519) 944-2295

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - California
USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMA PRAKASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAKASH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004