Prangley, Catherine Anne (CPSO#: 74707)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Dundas Street
Dundas ON  L9H 1A1
Phone: (905) 628-6151
Fax: (905) 628-1609
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Prangley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Prangley ( CPSO# 74707 )

Business Address:
33 Dundas Street
Dundas ON  L9H 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 628-6151

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANNE PRANGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRANGLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2003