Prasad, Anisha (CPSO#: 104011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HealthOne Medical Centre
5292 Yonge St
North York
North York ON  M2N 5P9
Phone: (416) 223-6666
Fax: 416-223-5335
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

College Care Clinic
343 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 1S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 519-9086
Fax: 416-519-8503
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANISHA PRASAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRASAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016