Prasad, Lakshman (CPSO#: 24903)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Patna University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Mar 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014