Prasad, Roopa (CPSO#: 78830)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Wales, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Jonathan D. J. Adachi's Tel: (905) 529-1317
Date Received: 08 Jul 2009

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2003 to 11 Apr 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2009