Prasad, Sharada (CPSO#: 33053)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian, Hindi, Kannada, Tamil

Education:Mysore University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sharada Prasad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Ian Park 459A Dundas Street West Trenton ON K8V 3S4
Date Received: 02 Nov 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2016

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: May 31, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Prasad has voluntarily ceased to practice medicine in all jurisdictions, effective May 31, 2016.

Dr. Prasad has voluntarily resigned from the College, effective August 31, 2016, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.