Pratt, Kathleen Joyce (CPSO#: 70665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Mar 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1805 Modeland Road
Sarnia ON  N7S 5M7
Phone: 519 490 8079
Fax: (519) 332-2812
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 490-8079
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pratt ( CPSO# 70665 )

Business Address:
1805 Modeland Road
Sarnia ON  N7S 5M7
Phone Number: (519) 491-6439

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 22, 2013
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 14, 2013, Bluewater Health notified the College that Dr. Pratt's privileges were restricted, effective May 22, 2013.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Colorectal Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1997
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2013
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 04 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Mar 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                       DR. KATHLEEN JOYCE PRATT
                                             ("Dr. Pratt")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

            "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the
            Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

            "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 

            (2)   I, Dr. Pratt, certificate of registration number 70665, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information respecting my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Pratt, acknowledge that I currently practise only at Bluewater
                  Health and do not have privileges at any other hospital.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Pratt, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Practice Restrictions
                  (a)   I, Dr. Pratt, undertake that my scope of practice will be
                        restricted to the following:
                  
                        (i)   practising as a surgical assistant under the direction of a
                              surgeon approved by the College (a "Qualified Surgeon") who
                              must always be physically present when I am engaging in
                              practice as a surgical assistant; 
                        (ii)  providing minor office-based procedures conducted under local
                              anesthesia, including conducting consultations and providing
                              prescriptions for medications required in relation to the
                              office-based procedures; and 
                        (iii) should I wish to expand my scope to also include screening
                              colonoscopies, I may do so only under the following
                              conditions: 
                              1.    I must give the College thirty (30) days' notice of my
                                    desire to expand my scope of practice to include
                                    screening colonoscopies; 
                              2.    I may only provide screening colonoscopies under the
                                    supervision of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the
                                    College on the following terms: 
                  
                                    a)    Phase I: for a minimum of three (3) months, the
                                          Clinical Supervisor must observe all
                                          colonoscopies. At the end of the three-month
                                          period, the Clinical Supervisor would report to
                                          the College on my standard of care, including my
                                          documentation and the timeliness of my
                                          communication with referring physicians, and on
                                          my compliance with Health Quality Ontario's
                                          standards for colonoscopies. The Clinical
                                          Supervisor would also provide a recommendation to
                                          the College regarding whether the clinical
                                          supervision can be reduced;
                  
                                    b)    Phase 2: if the Clinical Supervisor recommends
                                          and the College approves, after three (3) months
                                          the supervision would be reduced. I, Dr. Pratt,
                                          would maintain a log of all colonoscopies in
                                          which there are adverse events, and would meet
                                          with my Clinical Supervisor nine (9) months after
                                          the termination of Phase 1, to review all
                                          colonoscopy cases where there were adverse
                                          events. The Clinical Supervisor would then report
                                          to the College. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pratt, undertake that I will not engage in any practice of
                        medicine that is not expressly and specifically listed in section
                        (5)(a) above.
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Pratt, undertake to obtain the College's approval of each and
                  every location that I practise or have privileges ("Practice Location"),
                  prior to commencing at that location.

            (7)   Compliance and Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pratt, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution that
                        may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pratt, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pratt, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and/or patient charts by a College representative for the purposes
                        of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Pratt, undertake to comply with the provisions of this Undertaking
                  and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking
                  may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and
                  may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee of the College. 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Pratt, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Pratt, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Pratt, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Pratt, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Pratt, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Pratt was the subject of a College investigation into whether
                        she meets the standard of care and/or is incompetent in her general
                        surgical practice.  As a result of the investigation, Dr. Pratt may
                        only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a
                        surgeon who is acceptable to the College, or provide minor
                        office-based procedures under local anesthesia including any
                        necessary consultations and prescriptions related to those minor
                        procedures. 
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Pratt, acknowledge that if I decide to seek to expand my scope of
                  practice to incorporate screening colonoscopies, the summary on the
                  College's Register will be amended accordingly to reflect the change in
                  my scope of practice and the terms that are then applicable to my
                  expanded scope of practice. 

            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Pratt, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Oct 2013
Summary:

 On October 3, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kathleen Joyce Pratt committed an act 
 of professional misconduct, in that she engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Pratt admitted the allegation. 

Dr. 
 Pratt submitted swabs from herself for testing for Methicillin Resistant Staphylococcus Aureus 
 ("MRSA") and disguised them under the name and identity of an employee without the knowledge 
 and/or consent of that individual. After learning she was MRSA positive, she treated herself for 
 the MRSA and returned to her regular duties as a surgeon at the hospital without seeking medical 
 care from any other physician and without confirming she was no longer colonized with MRSA. She 
 failed to take reasonable steps to ensure the accuracy of the health record of the staff member 
 under whose name she had submitted for testing. 

In addition to antibiotics for MRSA, Dr. Pratt 
 repeatedly prescribed other medication for herself between 2006 and 2012.

Dr. Pratt has taken a 
 boundaries and recordkeeping course, as well as attended educational sessions relevant to surgical 
 site infections and ethics. 

The Committee ordered and directed that:

(	the Registrar suspend 
 Dr. Pratt's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months commencing 12:01 a.m. 
 October 4, 2013.
(	Dr. Pratt appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
(	Dr. Pratt pay to the 
 College costs in the amount of $4,460 within 60 days of the Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 3, 2013

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kathleen Joyce Pratt to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 4, 2016:


Dr. Pratt was the subject of a College investigation into whether she meets the standard of care and/or is incompetent in her general surgical practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Pratt may only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a surgeon who is acceptable to the College, or provide minor office-based procedures under local anesthesia including any necessary consultations and prescriptions related to those minor procedures.