Preater, Beverley Erin (CPSO#: 111516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Bag 4000
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K2
Phone: 807 737-5161 Ext. page
Fax: 807-737-4364
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 May 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEVERLEY ERIN PREATER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREATER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Mar 2017 to 31 Mar 2017
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017