Prebble, Brenda Lynn (CPSO#: 83114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 137
Duntroon ON  L0M 1H0
Phone: (705) 220-4610
Fax: (705) 444-2061
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brenda Prebble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Prebble ( CPSO# 83114 )

Business Address:
2844 Simcoe Road 124
P.O. Box 86
Duntroon ON  L0M 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 220-4610

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA LYNN PREBBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREBBLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2008