Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Prebtani, Ally-Kareem Pyarali Habib (CPSO#: 70107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
McMaster University
237 Barton Street RM 411
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44599
Fax: (905) 577-1418
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 523-1714
Fax: (905) 577-1418
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ally P.H. Prebtani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Prebtani ( CPSO# 70107 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
McMaster University
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 523-1714

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLY-KAREEM PYARALI HABIB PREBTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREBTANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 09 Jan 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 08 Feb 2009

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Sep 2005
Summary:

 On September 29, 2005, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Prebtani committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
 suitability to practice medicine.  The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that the 
 Registrar suspend Dr. Prebtani(s certificate of registration for three (3) months, commencing 
 thirty (30) days after the date of this order, two (2) months of which suspension shall be 
 suspended provided that Dr. Prebtani successfully completes, at his own expense, a 
 College-approved Boundaries Course and a College-approved Anger Management Course and provides 
 proof thereof to the College.

Dr. Prebtani appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to 
 the Divisional Court on October 19, 2005, which stayed the decision of the Discipline Committee 
 pending the outcome of the appeal.  On December 8, 2008, Dr. Prebtani discontinued his appeal.  
 Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 08 Dec 2008
Hearing Date(s): Sep 29, 2005