Predescu, Oana (CPSO#: 80117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montreal General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1650 Cedar Avenue
Room D10 137.2
Montreal QC  H3G 1A4
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 45872

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OANA PREDESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREDESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 27 Oct 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2013