Prefontaine, Michel E. (CPSO#: 53388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Montreal, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55644
Fax: (519) 685-8176
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prefontaine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Prefontaine ( CPSO# 53388 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL E. PREFONTAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREFONTAINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2007