Preiner, John Leonard (CPSO#: 66473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 954-0307
Fax: (905) 836-9038
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Preiner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Preiner ( CPSO# 66473 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 954-0307

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN LEONARD PREINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREINER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000