Preisman, Sergey Valeryevich (CPSO#: 72061)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:First Leningrad Medical Institute, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 24 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Dec 1998