Premaratne, Manuja (CPSO#: 99957)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2013 to 24 May 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 25 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2015