Premi, Nora Jane (CPSO#: 66564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
155 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A4
Phone: (905) 528-8744
Fax: (905) 528-5849
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N.J. Premi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Premi ( CPSO# 66564 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
155 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A4
Phone Number: (905) 528-8744

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORA JANE PREMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1995