Prendergast, Caitlin Bridget (CPSO#: 105280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAITLIN BRIDGET PRENDERGAST shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PRENDERGAST is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. PRENDERGAST shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PRENDERGAST is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PRENDERGAST shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PRENDERGAST is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PRENDERGAST no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Jan 2015 to 25 Jan 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018